home
***
CD-ROM
|
disk
|
FTP
|
other
***
search
/
Internet Info 1994 March
/
Internet Info CD-ROM (Walnut Creek) (March 1994).iso
/
answers
/
rec
/
tv
/
sat-night-live
/
band-info
< prev
next >
Wrap
Internet Message Format
|
1994-03-25
|
4KB
Path: bloom-beacon.mit.edu!news.media.mit.edu!uhog.mit.edu!MathWorks.Com!mvb.saic.com!news.cerf.net!ihnp4.ucsd.edu!news.service.uci.edu!usenet
From: Doug Krause <dkrause@hydra.acs.uci.edu>
Newsgroups: alt.tv.snl,rec.arts.tv,alt.answers,rec.answers,news.answers
Subject: Saturday Night Live FAQ: Band Information
Supersedes: <snl_bandinfo_940220@hydra.acs.uci.edu>
Followup-To: poster
Date: 25 Mar 1994 15:11:33 GMT
Organization: Lido 24 Hr. Pizza and Video
Lines: 109
Approved: news-answers-request@MIT.EDU
Expires: 25 Apr 1994 00:00:00 GMT
Message-ID: <snl_bandinfo_940325@hydra.acs.uci.edu>
References: <snl_faq_940325@hydra.acs.uci.edu>
NNTP-Posting-Host: hydra.acs.uci.edu
Keywords: nbc snl saturday night band info
Xref: bloom-beacon.mit.edu alt.tv.snl:2106 rec.arts.tv:41192 alt.answers:2218 rec.answers:4599 news.answers:16830
Archive-name: tv/sat-night-live/band-info
Last-modified: 1994/01/13
Posting-Frequency: Monthly
Saturday Night Live FAQ: Band Information
==========================================
This is a compilation of information about the bands that
have played on Saturday Night Live. It was put together
for me by Dave Mackey <davemackey@BIX.com>.
THE SNL BAND
A kickin' group of musicians, they are. I don't have the names for
some of the earlier players, but for most of the later bunch (post-1985)
this list is practically complete. Those without dates are primarily
fill-ins.
Musical Directors:
Howard Shore (1975-1980 and 1985-1986)
Kenny Vance (1980-1981)
Tom Malone (1981-1985)
Cheryl Hardwick (1986-present)
G.E. Smith (1986-present)
Conductors:
Howard Johnson (1975-1980)
Kenny Vance (1980-1981)
Leon Pendarvis (1981-1990)
G.E. Smith (1990-present)
Keyboards:
Cheryl Hardwick (1975-1980, 1985-present)
Paul Shaffer (1975-1980)
Leroy Leon Pendarvis (1980-present)
Ray Chew (1980-1984)
Guitar:
Georg Wadenius (1975-1985)
G.E. Smith (1985-present)
Hiram Bullock
Bass:
Marcus Miller (1975-1980)
Neil Jason (1980-1983?)
Tom Barney (1983-1985)
Tom "T-Bone" Wolk (1985-1991)
Paul Ossola (1991-present)
Tony Garnier
Francisco Santana
Mark Egan
Drums:
Buddy Williams (1975-1985)
Steve Ferrone (1985-1986)
Chris Parker (1986-1991)
Matt Chamberlain (1991-1992)
Shawn Pelton (1992-present)
Trumpet:
Alan Rubin (1975-1984)
Tom Malone (1984-1985)
Earl Gardner (1985-present)
Britt Woodman
Jon Faddis
Kamau Adilifu
Trombone:
Tom Malone (1975-1985)
Steve Turre (1985-present)
Robin Eubanks
Barry Rogers (deceased)
Saxophones:
Howard Shore (1975-1980)
Lou Marini (1975-1984)
Howard Johnson (1975-1980)
Lew Del Gatto (1977-1979, 1985-present)
George Young (1979-1980, 1990-present)
Lawrence Feldman (1980-1984)
Ronald Cuber (1980-1984)
Michael Brecker (1984-1985)
Lenny Pickett (1985-present)
Alex Foster (1985-1990)
Percussion:
Crusher Bennett
Tuba:
Tony Price
Notes:
Of the current SNL band, Lenny Pickett and Lew Del Gatto have never
missed a show since 1985. Leon Pendarvis has been in the band for
the longest continuous stint, 14 seasons so far. Both he and Cheryl
Hardwick have spent fourteen seasons in the band, though Cheryl took
five years off to do other things.
The band has released two albums: "The Saturday Night Live Band" on
ProJazz records, featuring the Tom Malone-led group of the early 80's,
and "G.E. Smith And The Saturday Night Live Band: Get A Little" on
Liberty records featuring the entire current lineup with the exception
of Chris Parker, who returned to the band for the album.
--
**** Douglas Krause dkrause@uci.edu One yuppie can ruin ****
**** University of California, Irvine your whole day. ****